judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00099-CV
08-82-00099-CV
04/23/1982
Mandamus
Purvis, James H.
Culp, Vann, Judge
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1984Shuck purged
05/26/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/13/1982Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
05/12/1982Brief Filed
05/10/1982Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
05/04/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/28/1982Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus
04/28/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Denied
04/28/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/28/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Denied
04/28/1982Submission
04/28/1982Submitted
04/28/1982Case ready to be set
04/23/1982No description available.
04/23/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/26/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownRespondent
UnknownRelator
Trial Court Information