judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00291-CR
14-82-00291-CR
04/23/1982
Burglary
Greene, Gary Patrick
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/29/1983Mandate Issued
06/30/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
11/24/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
11/05/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
09/02/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
04/23/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/29/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
279,774
5 yrs. Prob.revk.