judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00504-CR
05-82-00504-CR
04/23/1982
Burglary of a Habitation
Norman Lewis Evers
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/13/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
11/23/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/29/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
06/23/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/13/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
02/08/1983Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/23/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
09/21/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/25/1982Findings of fact and conclusions of law filed
08/25/1982Reporters record filed
08/25/1982Clerks record filed
06/22/1982Motion for extension of time to file record filed
04/23/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/23/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Evers, Norman LewisCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Dallas
Honorable Dallas Criminal District Court Judge, Criminal District Court No. 4
F82-75853-LKMK
99 Years TDC