judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00100-CR
08-82-00100-CR
04/23/1982
Other Felony
Banda, Alberto Marin
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/08/1984Shuck purged
02/24/1984Mandate Issued
11/30/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/17/1983Submitted
05/04/1983Submission
03/16/1983Brief Filed
03/02/1983Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/14/1983Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/26/1983Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/12/1983Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/29/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/01/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/15/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/13/1982Brief Filed
10/13/1982Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/1982Record filed.
09/27/1982Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
08/04/1982Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/20/1982Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
05/04/1982Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/23/1982Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/24/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
205th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Sam W. Callan
34625-205