judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00101-CR
08-82-00101-CR
04/23/1982
Burglary
Amaya, Hector Saldivar
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1984Shuck purged
06/08/1983Mandate Issued
04/13/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/06/1983Motion postponed, to be heard later
03/23/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/09/1983Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/25/1983No description available.
02/09/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/29/1982Submitted
10/06/1982Submission
09/08/1982Brief Filed
08/19/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
08/04/1982Brief Filed
08/04/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/22/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
06/22/1982Brief Filed
05/26/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/14/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
04/23/1982Record filed.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/08/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
210th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Sam M. Paxson
35966-210
11 Years