judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00276-CR
01-82-00276-CR
04/23/1982
Burglary
Gonzales, David
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/10/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/01/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/23/1983Submitted
10/28/1983Submission
06/06/1983Brief filed
05/05/1983Brief filed
05/05/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/27/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/24/1983Supplemental transcript filed
03/21/1983Order entered
03/21/1983Order revoked - last order posted
03/10/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/03/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/03/1983Order entered
07/23/1982Record filed
04/21/1982Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/10/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
342,212
15 years