judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00044-CV
09-82-00044-CV
04/23/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Laird, Hubert A. et ux
Elliott, T. W. and Jimmy Clark
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/14/1984Mandate Issued
03/13/1984Case Returned from Higher Ct.
02/15/1984Writ FiledRefused
11/14/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
11/14/1983Writ Filed
10/13/1983Motion for Rehearing FiledOverruled
09/23/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/08/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/19/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
07/27/1982Brief Filed
07/02/1982Brief Filed
04/23/1982Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/14/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
88th District Court
Hardin
Honorable Lee G. Alworth
20,071