judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: DOUGLAS C. WILSON

Case Information: 10-BG-1031
Short Caption:IN RE: DOUGLAS C. WILSONClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN164-10Filed Date:08/20/2010

Opening Event Date:08/20/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentDouglas C. Wilson NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/20/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Superior Court for the Judicial District of Hartford, Connecticut, suspending respondent. Respondent is an inactive member of the District of Columbia Bar.
08/20/2010RECEIVED a copy of a letter to respondent from Bar Counsel advising respondent of Bar Counsel's proposed recommendation to the Court that respondent be suspended pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 11 (d) and advising respondent as to filing the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g).
09/03/2010ORDER Having received a certified copy of an order of the Superior Court for the Judicial District of Hartford, Connecticut, suspending respondent from the practice of law for nine months, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why he should not be suspended from the practice of law for nine months in the District of Columbia. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's responses no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the Court with the relevant portions of the record of the proceeding in the other disciplining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after servicce of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliancec with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
10/18/2010STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline.
10/19/2010TMC - statement of Bar Counsel - proposed order
11/04/2010FiledSUSPENSION ORDERED that Douglas C. Wilson, Esquire, is hereby suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia for a period of nine months. It is FURTHER ORDERED that for purposes of reinstatement respondent's suspension will not begin to run until such time as he files an affidavit that fully complies with the requirements of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g) (RD,TE,KG)
11/19/2010RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a copy of a letter to respondent advising respondent of his failure to file the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14.
01/12/2011AFFIDAVIT of respondent pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14
01/31/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a letter with certified copies of a Certificate Disposition and Indictment concerning respondent who was suspended by this court and are for informational purposes only.