judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00257-CV
04-82-00257-CV
04/26/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Craig, Sabine P.
Craig, Mickey Hans
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/18/1983Mandate Issued
11/18/1983Mandate Issued
08/08/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/08/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/04/1983Motion for Dismissal Filed
07/01/1983Case ready to be set
07/01/1983Case ready to be set
11/24/1982Requests Oral Argument
07/01/1982Brief Filed
06/01/1982No Description Available.
06/01/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/26/1982Appeal Bond Filed
04/01/1982Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/18/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
131st Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable John G. Yates
82-CI-1712