judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Eric Lloyd Shelton v. The State of Texas

Case: 14-16-00173-CR
14-16-00173-CR
03/04/2016
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
Eric Lloyd Shelton
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
12/20/2016Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
10/11/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
11/10/2017Case stored
11/10/2017Mandate issued
11/01/2017Mandate due to be issued
10/04/2017Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsREFUSED
08/14/2017Mandate due to be issued
08/09/2017Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant
08/09/2017Case forwarded to higher court
08/08/2017Petition for discretionary review filed
08/04/2017Petition for discretionary review was not filed
08/04/2017Petition for discretionary review due
07/03/2017Petition for discretionary review due
06/22/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGRANTED
06/16/2017Motion for rehearing was not filed
06/16/2017Motion for rehearing due
06/01/2017Memorandum opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/08/2017Submitted
01/24/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied
01/09/2017State brief due
12/20/2016Case ready to be set
12/20/2016Brief filed - oral argument not requested
12/09/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
12/09/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/09/2016State brief due
11/10/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
11/10/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/10/2016State brief due
10/20/2016Response due
10/11/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested
10/11/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
10/11/2016Appellants brief due
10/10/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/10/2016Notice of late brief
10/05/2016Appellants brief due
07/11/2016Supplemental clerks record filed
07/07/2016Appellants brief due
07/05/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
07/05/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/15/2016Reporters record due
06/07/2016Sealed clerk record filed
06/07/2016Clerks record filed
06/06/2016Response due
05/31/2016Response due
05/25/2016Letter filed
05/20/2016No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record
05/20/2016Letter filed
05/20/2016Reporters record filed
05/20/2016Reporters record due
05/20/2016Clerks record due
05/20/2016Record due
05/16/2016Letter filed
05/13/2016No reporters record filed in criminal case
05/12/2016Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record
03/04/2016Court reporters information sheet sent
03/04/2016Trial court clerks certification of record requested
03/04/2016Case began in court of appeals
02/22/2016Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
02/22/2016Notice of appeal filed in trial court
01/21/2016Sentence imposed in the trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/10/2017Case StoredCase stored
11/10/2042RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of Texas Ex Rel, Travis J. Koehn, Austin County District AttorneyCriminal - State of TexasJeri Yenne
David P. Bosserman
Shelton, Eric LloydCriminal - AppellantJosh Barrett Schaffer
Michael Mowla  
Trial Court Information
412th District Court
Brazoria
69746
Jill Friedrichs