judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00189-CR
04-82-00189-CR
04/26/1982
Capital Murder
Garcia, Robert
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ No Action Taken
04/29/1983Motion to Make Available a Document DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/25/1983Motion to Make Available a Document Filed
03/03/1983Case ready to be set
03/02/1983Brief Filed
02/02/1983Brief Filed
01/04/1983Record Approved
12/17/1982No Description Available.Filing is Moot
12/15/1982No Description Available.
12/02/1982Record Filed
11/01/1982Record Filed
10/19/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/18/1982No Description Available.
07/06/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/24/1982No Description Available.
04/26/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
04/26/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/16/1982Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/20/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
186th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mike M. Machado
82-CR-0666
Life