judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00102-CV
08-82-00102-CV
04/23/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Cactus Drilling Corporation of Texas and Foy Boyd &
Ellwade Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1984Shuck purged
12/20/1982Mandate Issued
10/13/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/04/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
09/17/1982Submission
09/17/1982Submitted
07/14/1982Brief Filed
07/14/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/01/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
06/09/1982Brief Filed
05/24/1982Supplemental Transcript Filed
05/20/1982Statement of Facts Filed
05/12/1982Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/05/1982Motion for Ext Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/28/1982Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
04/28/1982Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
04/28/1982Transcript Filed
04/23/1982Motion - Extension to File Transcript filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/20/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
70th District Court
Ector
A-58,248