judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00272-CR
01-82-00272-CR
04/23/1982
Robbery
Gracia, John A.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/13/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/26/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/11/1984Brief due for retained counsel
01/16/1984Order entered
01/16/1984Order entered
01/02/1984Brief due for retained counsel
01/31/1983Supplemental transcript filed
07/15/1982Record filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/13/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
338,718
6 years