judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CUMPLIDO (GUSTAVO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34815
Short Caption:CUMPLIDO (GUSTAVO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36291 , 39349 , 43374 , 46105
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C157638Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08582
09/23/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 20, 1999 and August 12, 1999 (with disk). Court Reporter: Lisa Makowski. Mailed on 09/20/99. 99-09064
09/29/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 9, 1999. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 99-09303
10/05/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: October 18, 1999. 99-09519
10/25/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10391
10/25/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-10392
11/09/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-11041
11/09/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 99-11042
12/20/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we remand this matter to a different district court judge for an evidentiary hearing on appellant's claim that he was not aware that probation was not available. If the court determines that the claim has merit, the court shall permit appellant to withdraw his guilty plea." fn1[We conclude that the other claims in the motion to withdraw the guilty plea are not supported by specific factual allegations that, if true, would entitle appellant to relief]. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-12868
01/18/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-00688
01/18/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/28/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 21, 2000. 00-00688