judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL GENE EDMONSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0165)
Case Number:S-07-0165Case Docketed On:07/20/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:MICHAEL GENE EDMONSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL GENE EDMONSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael Gene EdmonsonSylvia Lee Hackl
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/20/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/31/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel for appellantMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
08/31/2007Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
08/31/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance for Sylvia Lee Hackl to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
08/31/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/31/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/18/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
09/18/2007Affidavit - Other - in support of motion to withdrawAffidavitOtherFinal
09/18/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/18/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/20/2007Motion - Appointment of counsel, pro se (motion for extension of time also received--order previously entered)MotionAppointment of counselFinal
10/02/2007Order - Denying withdrawal of counsel and Order denying motion for appointment of counsel.OrderDenying withdrawal of counselFinal
10/23/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
10/23/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/23/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal