judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAMION FLUELLYN V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVS.

Case Information: 10-AA-1025
Short Caption:DAMION FLUELLYN V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Lead: 10-AA-0689 Consolidated:10-AA-1025
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB101-10Filed Date:08/20/2010

Opening Event Date:08/20/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/28/2010
Argued/Submitted:05/12/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/23/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDamion Fluellyn N
Richard W. Galiher, Jr.YN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/20/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
08/20/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
08/20/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq. & Gregory Lamb, Esq.
08/27/2010 ORDERED, that petitioner's motion to consolidate is gratned and petitions for review nos. 10-AA-689 and 10-AA-1025 are consolidated fo all purposes herein. It is F/O that petitioner's motion to stay briefin is granted to the extent that a consolidated briefing order will be issued upon the filing of the record in petition for review no. 10-AA-1025. It is F/O that the agency shall file the record in petition for review no. 10-AA-1025 within 60 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
08/27/2010RECORD ON APPEAL (10-AA-1025)
09/03/2010 ORDERED that petitioner's consolidated brief and the appendix, including the document required by D.C. App. R. 39(a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's and intervenor's briefs shall be field within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
10/13/2010PETITIONER'S BRIEF
10/13/2010APPENDIX - petitioner's
10/26/2010INTERVENOR'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF NO OPPO 30 days 12/13/10
11/03/2010 On consideration of the motion of intervenor_ for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion of intervenor is granted and the brief of intervenor shall be filed on or before December 13, 2010. (JAC)
12/02/2010 It appearing that the brief of petitioner was filed with this court on October 13, 2010, and the brief of respondent was due to be filed on or before November 17, 2010, but the brief has not yet been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the brief out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (JAC)
12/13/2010INTERVENOR'S BRIEF
12/17/2010RESPONDENT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to statement in lieu of brief no oppo
12/17/2010RECEIVED- respondent's statement in lieu of brief
12/20/2010PTNR MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (Fluellyn) to 1/15/11 no oppo
12/28/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION and the lodged statement in lieu of brief is filed.
12/28/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE REPLY BRF and the reply brief of petitioner shall be filed on or before January 18, 2011. It is F/O that this matter shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of this court as soon as the calendar permits. (JAC)
12/28/2010STATEMENT
12/28/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/18/2011PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF
02/02/2011FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
02/02/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of April 2011 through June 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by FEB. 14, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
02/09/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING (Petitioner)
02/09/2011LETTER - from DOES letting court no that DOES will no participate in appeal
02/10/2011APPEARANCE of Sarah Rollman as counsel for intervenor.
02/10/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING intervenor
02/10/2011APPEARANCE- of Sarah Rollman on behalf of intervenor
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/10/2011LETTER - from petitioner regarding corrections made in the reply brief
05/11/2011LETTER - from the intervenor (WMATA) stating that Sarah O. Rollman will argue the case in place of Mark F. Sullivan
05/12/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/12/2011ARGUED before Judges Ruiz, Glickman, Terry Richard W. Galiher, Jr. Esq, for the APPELLANT Sarah O. Rollman, Esq. for the APPELLEE
06/28/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Glickman, Associate Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired*, and Terry, Senior Judge.)
07/23/2012FiledMandate