judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF FREMONT COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 26, MARISSA ROOT, MIKE LEISCHNER, JIM ANDERSON, JAMES CROUCH, BILL RUSSELL, and STEVE COOPER in their official capacities as Trustees of the Board of Trustees of Fremont County School District No. 25 v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, by and through JIM McBRIDE, in his official capacity as State Superintendent of Public Instruction and ARTHUR DYKMAN and KATHLEEN DYKMAN (HAYS) on behalf of Student L.D.

Case Heading (06-99)
Case Number:06-99Case Docketed On:05/04/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Education (Title 21)
Short Title:BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF FREMONT COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 26, MARISSA ROOT, MIKE LEISCHNER, JIM ANDERSON, JAMES CROUCH, BILL RUSSELL, and STEVE COOPER in their official capacities as Trustees of the Board of Trustees of Fremont County School District No. 25 v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, by and through JIM McBRIDE, in his official capacity as State Superintendent of Public Instruction and ARTHUR DYKMAN and KATHLEEN DYKMAN (HAYS) on behalf of Student L.D.
Full Title:BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF FREMONT COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 26, MARISSA ROOT, MIKE LEISCHNER, JIM ANDERSON, JAMES CROUCH, BILL RUSSELL, and STEVE COOPER in their official capacities as Trustees of the Board of Trustees of Fremont County School District No. 25, Appellants (Petitioners), WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, by and through JIM McBRIDE, in his official capacity as State Superintendent of Public Instruction, Appellee (Respondent), and ARTHUR DYKMAN and KATHLEEN DYKMAN (HAYS) on behalf of Student L.D., Appellees (Intervenors).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBoard of Trustees of Fremont County School District No. 26Richard D. Bush
Brandi Lee Monger
Joel M. Vincent
AppellantMarissa RootRichard D. Bush
Brandi Lee Monger
Joel M. Vincent
AppellantMike LeischnerRichard D. Bush
Brandi Lee Monger
Joel M. Vincent
AppellantJim AndersonRichard D. Bush
Brandi Lee Monger
Joel M. Vincent
AppellantJames CrouchRichard D. Bush
Brandi Lee Monger
Joel M. Vincent
AppellantBill RussellRichard D. Bush
Brandi Lee Monger
Joel M. Vincent
AppellantSteve CooperRichard D. Bush
Brandi Lee Monger
Joel M. Vincent
AppelleeDepartment of EducationPatrick J. Crank
Robin Sessions Cooley
Jill E. Kucera
AppelleeArthur DykmanBuck Gwyn
Marci Hoff Linde
Todd David Koehler
AppelleeKathleen DykmanBuck Gwyn
Marci Hoff Linde
Todd David Koehler

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/04/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/04/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/04/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/04/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/09/2006Motion - Stay briefing - opposedMotionStay briefing - opposedFinal
05/09/2006Memorandum - In support of motionMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
05/26/2006Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
05/26/2006Memorandum - In support of motion to dismissMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
05/26/2006Memorandum - Other -opposing motion to stayMemorandumOtherFinal
05/26/2006Notice-Incoming - Other - Traverse to motion to stayNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
05/26/2006Memorandum - Other in support of Traverse to motionMemorandumOtherFinal
06/09/2006Response/Objection - Motion to dismiss appealResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
06/15/2006Order - Denying motion to stayOrderDenyFinal
06/20/2006Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
08/10/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal