judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

POLK (LEVENRAL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34816
Short Caption:POLK (LEVENRAL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39529 , 52733
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C157260Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/16/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-08583
09/21/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-08964
09/27/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 3/22/98 all proceedings; 4/29/99 all proceedings; 5/4/99 all proceedings; 5/6/99 all proceedings; trial commencing on 5/11/99 and ending on 5/18/99; penalty hearing on 5/20/99; 7/15/99 all proceedings. To Court Reporter: Robert Mintun. 99-09196
11/02/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 03/22/99; 04/29/99; 05/04/99; 05/06/99; 05/11/99; 05/11/99 thru 05/14/99 and 05/17/99 05/18/99; 05/12/99; 05/13/99; 05/14/99; 05/17/99; and 05/20/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Robert Mintun. 99-10646
12/22/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 7, 2000. 99-13019
02/04/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-01775
02/09/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before March 22, 2000. 00-02037
03/29/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-05029
03/29/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 45 pages. 00-05039
04/03/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The opening brief and appendix provisionally submitted on March 29, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. 00-05288
04/03/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. 00-05030
04/03/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 00-05032
04/28/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-06941
05/24/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 27, 2000. 00-08669
06/27/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Application for Extension of Time. 00-10957
07/05/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motion filed June 27, 2000, is granted. Appellant's reply brief shall be served and filed on or before July 11, 2000. 00-11486
07/14/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-12151
03/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-04755
03/16/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Southern Nevada Panel. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB
05/16/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-08104
06/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08127
06/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 19, 2001. 01-08127