judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00095-CR
04-82-00095-CR
04/30/1982
Burglary
Hammond, Karl
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ No Action Taken
08/09/1982Brief Filed
08/09/1982Case ready to be set
07/08/1982Brief Filed
06/09/1982Record Filed
06/08/1982Record Approved
03/03/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
03/03/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/20/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
290th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable David A. Berchelmann
81-CR-3495
8 years