judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00495-CR
04-81-00495-CR
04/29/1982
Burglary
Walton, Roy Thomas
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/22/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
08/19/1983Mandate Issued
08/19/1983Mandate Issued
06/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/20/1982Submission
10/20/1982Submission
10/20/1982Submitted
06/21/1982Brief Filed
06/21/1982Case ready to be set
06/21/1982Case ready to be set
05/26/1982Brief Filed
04/26/1982Record Approved
04/07/1982Record Filed
04/07/1982Record Filed
02/23/1982Record Filed
02/05/1982Record Filed
12/18/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
12/18/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
12/03/1981Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/02/2010RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
08/19/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
227th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mike M. Machado
81-CR-2208
30 years