judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00353-CV
01-82-00353-CV
04/30/1982
Miscellaneous/other civil
Estate of Mildred C. Pillons
Troegel, Joan Baker
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/18/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/18/1983No description available.
11/18/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/17/1983Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
02/07/1983Petition for writ of error from trial court
01/20/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
12/30/1982Motion for rehearing filed
12/16/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/16/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/04/1982Submitted
11/04/1982Submission
11/04/1982Submitted
10/01/1982Submission
06/18/1982Brief filed
06/02/1982Brief filed
05/19/1982Transcript filed
04/30/1982Appeal bond filed
04/30/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/18/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellant
StateAppellee
Trial Court Information