judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00215-CV
04-82-00215-CV
05/03/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Garcia, Martin, Et Al
Garcia, Celedino, Et Al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/07/1983Mandate Issued
10/07/1983Mandate Issued
10/06/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
09/17/1983Higher Court DecisionRefused
05/27/1983Writ of Error filed
04/27/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/27/1983Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/15/1983Response to Motion Filed
04/14/1983Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
04/07/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/23/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/23/1983No Description Available.Filing is Moot
03/23/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/17/1982Response to Motion Filed
08/05/1982No Description Available.
08/02/1982Response to Motion Filed
07/22/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/20/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
07/06/1982No Description Available.
06/23/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/23/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/04/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/18/1982No Description Available.
05/03/1982No Description Available.
05/03/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/21/1982Appeal Bond Filed
01/25/1982Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/07/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
229th Judicial District Court
Starr
Honorable Ricardo H. Garcia
3066-4
n/a