judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00413-CV
01-82-00413-CV
05/02/1982
Miscellaneous/other civil
Roger Explorations, Inc. et al
Vector Cable Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/21/1983No description available.
10/17/1983Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
06/06/1983Petition for writ of error from trial court
05/05/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
02/10/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/10/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/19/1983Submitted
01/19/1983Submission
01/19/1983Submitted
11/05/1982Supplemental brief filed
09/10/1982Brief filed
07/22/1982Supplemental transcript filed
07/15/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/08/1982Motion strans disposedGrant motion
07/08/1982Statement of facts filed
06/11/1982Motion for leave to file strans
06/08/1982Transcript filed
05/02/1982Appeal bond filed
05/02/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/21/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellee
StateAppellant
StateAppellant
Trial Court Information