judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00253-CR
04-82-00253-CR
05/03/1982
Marijuana Possession
Crews, Chris C.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/17/1983Mandate Issued
11/17/1983Mandate Issued
08/03/1983Motion to Withdraw DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/03/1983Motion to Withdraw DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/02/1983Motion to Withdraw Filed
08/16/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/10/1982No Description Available.
05/04/1982Notice of appeal received
05/03/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
05/03/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Ricardo H. Garcia
82-CR-386
PROBATION