judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SALAZAR (JOSE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44060
Short Caption:SALAZAR (JOSE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44478
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C193364Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/07/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-18669
11/04/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-20301
11/30/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-20543
11/30/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/06/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 2, 2004. 04-20543