judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEVADA CARDIOLOGY ASS'N VS. MINGORI

Case Information: 44061
Short Caption:NEVADA CARDIOLOGY ASS'N VS. MINGORICourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A484332
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A485507
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A475081
Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/19/2004 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/08/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lyles & Associates--check no. 30261.
10/08/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18743
10/19/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/27/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-19830
01/27/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 9, 2005. 05-01803
02/14/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 8, 2005. 05-02903
05/20/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Cisneros & Associates substitute in the place and stead of Lyles & Associates as counsel for appellant. 05-10022
05/23/2005Notice/Outgoing Letter. Janet Trost. (Substitution of Attorneys)
07/11/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-13691
07/11/2005Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 05-13692
07/15/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 05-14123
07/15/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.