judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PRUSHA VS. NIGHTINGALE OVERSEAS CO.

Case Information: 44081
Short Caption:PRUSHA VS. NIGHTINGALE OVERSEAS CO.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A487712Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/15/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/15/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-19119
10/15/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
11/02/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Virgina Prusha - money order no. 53519557916.
11/10/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal without prejudice to appellant's right to timely appeal from the final judgment." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-20714
12/07/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-21148
12/07/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/15/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 9, 2004. 04-21148