judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHACHAS VS. MILLER

Case Information: 44063
Short Caption:CHACHAS VS. MILLERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41461
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CV0304068Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/14/2004 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/08/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from George Chachas--The Greek check no. 3243.
10/08/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18756
10/14/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/19/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-19316
10/27/2004Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-19870
11/04/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals served on Settlement Judge. 04-20340
02/04/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-02300
02/10/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 05-02690
02/24/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Appellant's Response. 05-03725
03/08/2005Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 05-04600
03/14/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). 05-04948
03/14/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.