judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TAYLOR (JASON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44062
Short Caption:TAYLOR (JASON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38179
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C139686Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/15/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/08/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/08/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18744
11/17/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Appellant has failed to request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a). Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the appropriate document. 04-21139
11/29/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/09/04. To Court Reporter: Sonia Riley. 04-21671
11/29/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-21674
12/21/2004TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: August 9, 2004. Court Reporter: Sonia L. Riley. 04-23232
02/08/2005MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: March 9, 2005. 05-02521
02/24/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Rough Draft Transcript. On November 29, 2004, appellant filed a transcript request form that requested court reporter Sonia L. Riley to produce the transcript for proceedings conducted on August 9, 2004. On December 21, 2004, Ms. Riley filed a rough draft transcript of the requested proceeding. We note that this appeal concerns the imposition of a life sentence and therefore this appeal is not subject to NRAP 3C. Accordingly, the filing of a rough draft transcript was improper and Ms. Riley should have filed a certified copy of the August 9, 2004, transcript. Nevertheless, unless either party files an objection within 10 days from the date of this order, in the interest of judicial economy this court will waive the requirement that the requested transcript filed with this court be a certified copy. 05-03746
03/11/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-04886
03/23/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed March 11, 2005. Appellant shall have until April 8, 2005, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. 05-05708
04/11/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (third request-1 day requested) 05-07005
04/12/2005BriefReceived Opening Brief. 05-07137
04/13/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed April 11, 2005. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on April 12, 2005. 05-07192
04/13/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-07137
04/13/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 8. 05-07138
05/10/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-09122
05/10/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 05-09123
06/15/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed.
10/21/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06R-MD/RR/RP 05-20888
11/16/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-21728
11/16/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/28/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 21, 2005. 05-21728