judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SECURITY GUARD ITT ALARM SYS. VS. SPRINT SOLUTIONS

Case Information: 44097
Short Caption:SECURITY GUARD ITT ALARM SYS. VS. SPRINT SOLUTIONSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A461317
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A471340
Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/26/2004 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/17/2007How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/19/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Bowen Law Offices, Chtd.--check no. 2642.
10/19/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-19293
10/19/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/26/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/01/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 on cross-appeal from Ashby & Ranalli, L.L.P.--check no. 5178.
11/01/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 04-19986
11/02/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on October 25, 2004. 04-20174
11/02/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. Stephen E. Haberfeld. (notice of cross-appeal)
11/04/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. Stephen E. Haberfeld. (case appeal statement)
11/05/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 04-20420
11/08/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. Stephen E. Haberfeld. (docketing statement of appellant/cross-respondent)
12/06/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 3, 2005. 04-22225
12/21/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. fn1[Appellant shall serve the docketing statement on counsel for respondent and on settlement judge Stephen Haberfeld.] 4-23278
12/29/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-23681
01/10/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Respondent/Cross-Appellant Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 05-00532
01/31/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-01954
02/07/2005Other Other. Filed Motion to Dismiss Capitol Indemnity Corporation and Safeco Insurance Company. 05-02401
02/18/2005MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Time for Safeco Insurance Company to File an Opposition to Respondents Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Communications Company Limited Partnership, Sprint/United Midwest Management Company, and Sprint International Communication's Motion to Dismiss. 05-03282
02/18/2005MotionReceived Response to Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondent SAFCO Insurance Company's Opposition to Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Motion to Dismiss. 05-03288
03/14/2005MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 05-05028
03/29/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Order Denying Motion and Reinstating Briefing. On February 7, 2005, respondents/ cross-appellants ('respondents') filed a motion to dismiss the appeal of appellants/ cross-respondents Capitol and Safeco. On February 18, 2005, the parties filed a stipulation to extend the time allowed for Safeco to file a response to respondents' motion. We approve that stipulation. The clerk shall file the response received on February 18, 2005. Because Capitol and Safeco were clearly identified in the notice of appeal as appellants, we deny respondents' motion to dismiss. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellants/cross respondents (appellants) and respondent/cross-appellants (respondents) shall each have 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Appellants shall have 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Respondents shall have 30 days from service of appellants' opening brief to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellants shall have 30 days from service of respondents' combined brief to file and serve a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondents shall have 30 days from service of appellants' combined reply brief to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal, if deemed necessary. 05-06056
03/29/2005MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondent Safco Insurance Company's Opposition to Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Motion to Dismiss. 05-03288
03/29/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. On March 14, 2005, appellant/cross-respondent Capitol Indemnity Corporation (Capitol) and respondents/cross-appellants (respondents) filed a stipulation that Capitol will dismiss its appeal as to respondents, and respondents will dismiss their cross-appeal as to Capitol. Cause appearing, we approve the stipulation and dismiss the appeal of Capitol and the cross-appeal of respondents as to Capitol only. The clerk of this court shall modify the caption by deleting Capitol Indemnity Corporation as an appellant/cross-respondent. 05-06060
04/14/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Security Guard I.T.T. & C & T Communications. Transcripts requested: 07/12/04. To Court Reporter: Dep't. VII, Eighth Judicial District. Issued Notice for a corrected proof of service. 05-07283
04/20/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Appellant/Cross-Respondent Safeco Ins. and Respondents/Cross-Appellants.
04/25/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Certificate of Service for Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 05-08103
04/25/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Respondents/Cross-Appellants. Transcripts requested: 07/12/04. To Court Reporter: Dept. VII of the Eighth Judicial District Court. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. 05-08111
04/29/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Transcript of Proceedings. 05-08494
05/16/2005MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Dismissal. 05/26/05 ORDER: WE WILL TAKE NO ACTION ON THIS DUPLICATIVE STIPULATION.jcr 05-09531
05/26/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Stipulation and Directing Appellant Safeco Insurance Company to Comply with NRAP 9(a). On March 29, 2005, a clerk's order approving the stipulation and partially dismiss this appeal was filed. On May 16, 2005, Capitol and respondents filed a stipulation that is essentially identical to the one filed on March 14, 2005. We will take no action on the duplicative stipulation that was filed on May 16, 2005. Appellant Safeco shall have 10 days from the date of this order to request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a). Failure to comply timely with this order may resut in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of appellant Saveco's appeal. 05-10425
06/03/2005MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal of Appellant/Cross-Respondent Safeco. 05-10969
06/28/2005MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 27, 2004. 05-12748
07/21/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-14454
07/21/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (filed by fax) Due date: 10 days.
07/28/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service for Motion for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief. 05-15040
07/29/2005MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents/Cross-Appellants Opposition to Appellants Motion for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief. 05-15104
09/21/2005MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondent/Cross-Appellants Motion to Dismiss Based Upon Appellants Failure to Comply with Procedural Rules of Appellate Process. 05-18728
09/21/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. (Service by fax not permitted.) Due date: 10 days.
09/26/2005MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Motion to Dismiss Based Upon Appellants Failure to Comply with Procedural Rules of Appellate Process. 05-19093
09/28/2005Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter (pursuant to NRAP 27(a)), (Respondents/Cross-Appellants Reply to Appellants Opposition to Respondents Motion to Dismiss Based Upon Appellants Failure to Comply with Procedural Rules of Appellate Process).
10/18/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Status Supplement to Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. 05-20571
11/02/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Affidavit. 05-21610
11/02/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Affidavit. Due date: 10 days.
11/07/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second Status Supplement to Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. 05-21930
11/09/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. 05-22114
11/29/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Safeco has filed a motion to voluntarily dismiss its appeal. We grant the motion and dismiss Safeco's appeal and direct the clerk to delete Safeco as an appellant/cross-respondent in the caption of this appeal. fn2[Court reporter Joann Orduna is not obligated to prepare a transcript for this appeal.] Transcripts due: 20 days. If more time is needed, Ms. Silvaggio shall file a motion requesting an extension of time or if the requested transcripts cannot be produced, she shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. fn3[All further documents filed in this appeal must be served in accordance with NRAP 25(1)(c).] Opening brief and appendix of Security Guard due: 40 days. 05-23458
12/30/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 07/13/04 and 07/14/04. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 05-25479
01/11/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-00776
01/11/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 06-00784
02/13/2006MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 14, 2006. 06-03142
03/13/2006Order/Procedural Order. Transcript for proceedings conducted on July 12, 2005 due: 20 days. If more time is needed, Ms. Silvaggio shall within the same period, file a motion requesting an extension or if the transcript cannot be produced, notify this court, in writing, of this fact. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including monetary sanctions and referral to the Certified Shorthand Reporters Board of Nevada. 06-05353
03/16/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. 06-05723
03/17/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. - Certicate of Service to Respondent's Answering Brief. (Attached to inside back cover of original and copies of brief.) 06-05765
04/20/2006MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 17, 2006. 06-08377
05/24/2006Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
05/25/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-11129
06/28/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Order Regarding Transcript and Granting Extension of Time. Within 5 days from the date of this order, Ms. Silvaggio and Ms. Orduna shall each inform this court in writing whether she reported the July 12, 2004, proceedings. The court reporter who was present at the July 12, 2004 proceedings, shall have 20 days to prepare, file and deliver the transcript. If more time is needed, the court reporter shall file a motion requesting an extension or if the transcript cannot be produced, notify this court, in writing. Reply brief from appellants/cross-respondents due: 50 days. 06-13303
08/14/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Monday, July 12, 2004. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 06-16961
08/21/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second Request. 06-17332
08/24/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply brief of Appellants/cross-respondents due: 10 days. 06-17638
09/11/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellants/Cross-Respondents. 06-18717
10/19/2006MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Respondents/Cross-Appellants Motion to Strike Portions of Appellants' Reply Brief. 06-21555
10/31/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Respondents/Cross-Appellants Motion to Strike Portions of Appellants' Reply Brief. 06-22161
11/07/2006Other Returned Unfiled Document. Respondents/Cross-Appellants Reply to Appellants' Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Appellants' Reply Brief.
11/14/2006MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Respondents/Cross-Appellants Motion to File a Repy to Appellant's Opposition to Respondents/Cross-Appellants Motion to Strike Portions of Appellants' Reply Brief. 06-23276
12/01/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We deny the motion to strike portions of the reply brief on appeal. Respondents shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a reply brief on cross-appeal, if deemed necessary. Fn1 [Cause appearing, we grant respondents' motion to file a reply to appellants' opposition. The clerk of the court shall file the reply to appellants' opposition received on November 14, 2006.] 06-24583
12/01/2006MotionFiled Reply to Response. Respondents/Cross-Appellants Repy to Appellant's Opposition to Respondents/Cross-Appellants Motion to Strike Portions of Appellants' Reply Brief 06-23281
01/17/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Neada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 07-01149
01/17/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. NNP07- RP/JH/NS.
02/13/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. This is an appeal and cross-appeal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-03509
03/13/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-05457
03/13/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/21/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 16, 2007. 07-05457