judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KUSHNER VS. WORTHINGTON

Case Information: 47956
Short Caption:KUSHNER VS. WORTHINGTONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A486344
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A499255
Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/08/2006 / Kaufman, JerrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/30/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Goodman Brown & Premsrirut--check no. 005503.
08/30/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-18055
09/08/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jerry J. Kaufman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/18/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-19165
09/18/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of 12/23/2005 Death of Respondent Party Lydia Escoto. 06-19235
10/16/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 06-21265
10/16/2006Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 06-21266
10/16/2006Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 06-21267
11/16/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 06-23546
11/16/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.