judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEVIN VS. MARKHAM

Case Information: 44098
Short Caption:LEVIN VS. MARKHAMCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A416557Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/27/2004 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/19/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lyles & Associates (Nevada General Insurance Co. check no. 31372).
10/19/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-19299
10/27/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/28/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Christensen Law Offices, Chtd.--check no. 105562.
10/28/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 04-19951
11/02/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. Kathleen M. Paustian. (notice of cross-appeal)
11/03/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 04-20235
11/18/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent) 04-21324
01/10/2005Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 05-00535
01/28/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 05-01834
01/28/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.