judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BLASHOCK (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44099
Short Caption:BLASHOCK (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47307
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C189498Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/21/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/19/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/19/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-19298
11/09/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Accordingly, the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. In the event the district court enters a written judgment or order (or has already entered a written judgment or order of which this court is unaware), the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court. Further, the clerk of the district court shall, within 60 days from the date of this order, transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings). 04-20627
12/21/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 04-23225
12/21/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/19/2005Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Clark County Clerk. The Order to Deny Motion for Sentence Modification has not been filed yet. 05-01152
01/31/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. On November 9, 2004, this court ordered the district court to either enter a written order or inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision within 30 days. The district court has failed to respond to this court's order. This court directs that the district court shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision, or (3) inform this court that it is unable to comply with this court's order because a party ordered to prepare the written order has not timely submitted an order for the district court's consideration. In the event the district court enters a written judgment or order (or has already entered a written judgment or order of which this court is unaware), the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment to the clerk of this court. 05-01950
02/14/2005Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on February 10, 2005. 05-02898
06/07/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. the record on appeal does not contain a transcript of the evidentiary hearing conducted on August 26, 2004. If the transcript has been prepared and filed with the district court, the clerk of the district court shall transmit, as a supplemental record on appeal, a certified copy of the transcript to the clerk of this court within 10 days from the date of this order. If the transcript has not been prepared and filed below, the district court shall order its prompt preparation. If such an order is required, the clerk of the district court shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to transmit a copy of the district court's order to the clerk of this court. The clerk of the district court shall then have 10 days from the date the transcript is filed within which to transmit a certified copy of the transcript to the clerk of this court as a supplemental record on appeal. 05-11145
08/31/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 26, 2004. Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. 05-17252
09/15/2005TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: August 26, 2005. Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. 05-18339
10/18/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response from the State due: 30 days 05-20578
10/26/2005MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 05-21262
12/06/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for n evidentiary hearing on Blashock's appeal deprivation claim." fn11[This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH 05-23856
01/03/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-00007
01/03/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/19/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 5, 2006. 06-00007