judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAMACHO (CANDIDO) VS. STATE C/W 47948

Case Information: 47947
Short Caption:CAMACHO (CANDIDO) VS. STATE C/W 47948Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:47947*, 47948 Related Case(s): 45646 , 47589 , 47948
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C209828Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/29/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17961
09/07/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 06-18528
09/14/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed 8/30/06. Due Date: 10 days
09/22/2006Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 8/30/06 (submitted in response to notice issued on 9/14/06). 06-19515
01/05/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn15[We have reviewed all proper person documents, and we conclude that no relief is warranted.] SNP07-MG/MD/MC. Nos. 47947/47948 07-00371
01/30/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-01987
01/30/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/08/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 5, 2007. 07-01987