judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAMACHO (CANDIDO) VS. STATE C/W 47947

Case Information: 47948
Short Caption:CAMACHO (CANDIDO) VS. STATE C/W 47947Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 47947 *, 47948Related Case(s): 45646 , 47589 , 47947
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C209828Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/31/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/29/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17962
09/11/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 06-18699
10/06/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. 06-20488
10/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Pro Per Motion to correct Illegal Sentence filed in district court on October 11, 2006. 06-21248
10/31/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 06-22166
10/31/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/05/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn15[We have reviewed all proper person documents, and we conclude that no relief is warranted.] SNP07-MG/MD/MC. Nos. 47947/47948 07-00372
01/30/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-01988
01/30/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/08/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 5, 2007. 07-01988