judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SFPP, L.P. VS. DIST. CT. (CITY OF RENO)

Case Information: 47951
Short Caption:SFPP, L.P. VS. DIST. CT. (CITY OF RENO)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0205851Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Cert/Man/Pro
Disqualifications:Hardesty, ParraguirreCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/12/2007How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/30/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lionel Sawyer & Collins--check no. 031152.
08/30/2006Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. 06-17988
08/30/2006AppendixFiled Appendix. Exhibits, Volumes 1 through 3. 06-17992
08/30/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Petition for Writ - served on Judge Adams. 06-18060
09/11/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of district court Stay of Proceedings. 06-18760
09/13/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 06-18906
09/21/2006MotionFiled Stipulation. for Extension of Time to Submit Answer to Original Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. 06-19430
09/28/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. The real party in interest shall have until November 14, 2006, to file and serve its answer. 06-19851
11/14/2006Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 06-23263
11/14/2006AppendixFiled Appendix. Exhibits to Answer to Original Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief, Exhibits A-F. 06-23264
11/28/2006OtherDisqualification of Justice Parraguirre.
12/18/2006MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Permission to File a Reply to Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. 06-25814
12/18/2006Petition/WritReceived Reply to Answer to Petition. Reply in Support of Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. FILED PER ORDER OF 1/11/07. 06-25816
01/11/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed 12/18/06. We grant petitioners' motion and direct the court clerk to file petitioners' reply, received in this court on December 18, 2006. 07-00766
01/11/2007Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. for Extraordinary Writ Relief. 06-25816
01/11/2007AppendixFiled Appendix. to Reply in Support of Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief Exhibits 34-36. 06-26762
02/12/2007OtherDisqualification of Justice Hardesty. Sat in district court proceedings.
02/12/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Justice Disqualification. 07-03374
02/16/2007MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Permission to File a Sur-reply in Support of Answer to Original Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. 07-03983
02/16/2007Other Other. Received Sur-reply in Support of Answer to Original Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. 07-03984
02/28/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Permission to File Sur-Reply in Support of Answer. 07-04792
03/09/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to file Sur-Reply. We direct the clerk of this court to file the real party in interest's sur-reply, provisionally received on February 16, 2007. 07-05679
03/09/2007Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Sur-Reply of the Real Party in Interest in Support of Answer to Original Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. 07-03984
03/12/2007Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter (pursuant to NRAP 27(a)), "Objection to Opposition to Motion for Permission to File Sur-Reply in Support of Answer to Original Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief."
09/12/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this matter shall stand submitted for decision to the En Banc Court as of the date of this order on the papers filed herein. 07-20162
09/12/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/27/2007Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition Granted." fn1-[The Honorables James W. Hardesty and Ron Parraguirre, Justices, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Cherry, Michael A.. Majority: Cherry/Gibbons/Douglas/Saitta. Concurrence: Maupin. 123 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 56. EN BANC. 07-28061
12/27/2007WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Dan C. Bowen for service upon Judge Brent T. Adams. 07-28098
01/02/2008WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Brent Adams on December 28, 2007. 07-28098
01/22/2008RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 08-01127
01/22/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.