judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MANNING (TONY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44086
Short Caption:MANNING (TONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C195559Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/14/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/15/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/15/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 04-19149
10/15/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/27/04, 6/3/04, 6/8/04, 6/15/04, 6/24/04, 7/1/04, 7/27/04 and 8/31/04. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. Filed in district court on: October 8, 2004. 04-19150
11/15/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 27, 2004; June 3 2004; June 8, 2004; June 24, 2004; June 15, 2004; July 1, 2004; July 27, 2004; August 31, 2004. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. 04-20855
11/29/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-21654
11/29/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-21655
12/10/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-22578
01/13/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. This court has concluded that full briefing of this appeal is warranted. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party must file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. fn2[Transcripts have already been filed in this appeal. Should either party cite to transcripts not previously prepared, counsel shall file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts pursuant to NRAP 9(a). If the necessary transcripts have already been prepared and are on file in the district court, the parties may include such transcripts in the appendix without filing a transcript request form. See NRAP 30(b)(1).] Thereafter, briefing shall proceed as set forth in NRAP 31. 05-00816
02/16/2005MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 14, 2005. 05-03148
03/17/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-05247
04/08/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-06915
04/08/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 05-06916
05/19/2005Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
07/14/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 05-14015
07/14/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/21/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Vacating in Part, and Remanding. "Appellant's sentence is hereby vacated and this matter is remanded to the district court for imposition of the sentence pronounced on July 1, 2004." NNP06R-MD/RR/RP 05-20889
11/16/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-21729
11/16/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/28/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 21, 2005. 05-21729