judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8355
B-8355
03/30/1979
Application for Writ of Error
AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK AND TRUST COMPANY
MONONGAHELA REALTY PARTNERS, FIRST WISCONSIN MORTGAGE TRUST
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/28/1979Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/27/1979Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/09/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
04/17/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
04/09/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
04/06/1979Response to PetitionPetitioner
03/30/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
03/30/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/05/1979Response to Motion filed
06/28/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/27/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/09/1979Response to Petition
04/17/1979Response to Petition
04/09/1979Response to Petition
04/06/1979Response to Petition
03/30/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/30/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/30/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
American National Bank and Trust CompanyPetitioner
First Wisconsin Mortgage TrustRespondent
Monongahela Realty PartnersRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information