judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARSON CITY VS. CITY CENTER

Case Information: 44055
Short Caption:CARSON CITY VS. CITY CENTERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0000550AClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/19/2004 / King, PatrickSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/07/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18643
10/19/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/21/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-19476
10/26/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 04-19768
01/20/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-01285
02/18/2005Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 05-03255
02/28/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 05-03856
02/28/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.