judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOGDANOVICH VS. SHALLENBERGER

Case Information: 44056
Short Caption:BOGDANOVICH VS. SHALLENBERGERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37065 , 39774 , 44770
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 00CV0252Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Office of Jeffrey K. Rahbeck--check no. 7908.
10/07/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18660
10/07/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons.
10/12/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Documents. It has been determined that this appeal willl not be scheduled for settlement conference. Transcript request form due: 15 days. Opening Brief due: 120 days.
10/21/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-19444
10/27/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/28/00. To Court Reporter: Deborah Graco. 04-19856
10/27/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/05/00. To Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 04-19857
12/15/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/05/00; 10/11/00; 10/13/00; and 10/12/00. Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 04-22865
01/04/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcripts. On October 27, 2004, appellants filed a transcript request form requesting court reporter Deborah Greco to produce a transcript of proceedings held on September 28, 2000. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] To date, Ms. Greco has not filed the requested transcript. Our review of the district court records indicates that the transcript of proceedings conducted on September 28, 2000, was filed in the district court on or about July 23, 2004. We note that this appeal was docketed in this court on October 7, 2004, and therefore appellants improperly requested preparation of the transcript. Accordingly, Ms. Greco need not file and serve a transcript of proceedings conducted on September 28, 2000. 05-00173
01/25/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent may file a reply within 10 days of the date that appellant's response is served. 05-01609
02/24/2005MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 05-03709
03/22/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. The parties responded to the show cause order by filing a stipulation to dismiss this appeal without prejudice and to remand this matter to the district court. We disapprove the stipulation. "We dismiss this appeal." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-05575
04/19/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-06114
04/19/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/26/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 21, 2005. 05-06114