judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAUTERMAN VS. VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM

Case Information: 47955
Short Caption:DAUTERMAN VS. VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEMCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 51880
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A494711Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/01/2006 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/30/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Harris Schwartz LLP--check no. 3643.
08/30/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-18036
09/01/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/15/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-19099
09/18/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-19187
10/13/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 06-21125
10/13/2006Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 06-21126
10/23/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 06-21756
10/23/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.