judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSE VS. CLARK COUNTY

Case Information: 44078
Short Caption:JOSE VS. CLARK COUNTYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A466138Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/22/2004 / Roitman, HowardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/14/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Gage & Gage LLP--check no. 7123.
10/14/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-19054
10/14/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/18/2004Other Other. Returned, unfiled the original and two copies of the Case Appeal Statement.
10/22/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/01/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-20004
11/02/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on October 22, 2004. 04-20221
11/04/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. Howard Roitman. (case appeal statement)
03/07/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Setlement Judge was informed that Gage & Gage no longer represents the Appellant in this matter. 05-04470
03/18/2005MotionFiled Motion. Gage & Gage, L.L.P.'s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Record and for Stay in Proceedings. 05-05394
03/31/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of Douglas R. Johnson. 05-06383
03/31/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of Kacey Jose. 05-06384
03/31/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for the Affidavit of Kacey Jose and Affidavit of Douglas R. Johnson. 05-06385
04/01/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Affidavit of Douglas R. Johnson. 05-06471
09/08/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that counsel for appellant informed him that their firm no longer represents appellant. Thereafter, attorney Janelle Lavigne of the law firm of Gage & Gage filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record for appellant. Ms. Lavigne represents that appellant has now retained attorney Douglas R. Johnson of the law firm of Pico, Escobar & Rosenberger, Ltd. Mr. Johnson filed an affidavit in which he asserts that his firm does not represent appellant in this case. We grant Ms. Lavigne's motion to withdraw. The clerk of this court shall remove the law firm of Gage & Gage and the law firm of Pico, Escobar & Rosenberger from the docket in this appeal. Appellant shall have 20 days form the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to enter an appearance on her behalf. If appellant does not intend to retain new counsel for this appeal, she shall notify this court in writing within the same time period. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 05-17719
09/14/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Entry of Order - This court's order filed 9/8/05. 05-18216
12/20/2005Settlement Order/Procedural Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. We conclude that appellant will be proceeding without counsel. Because appellant is proceeding in proper person, we remove this appeal from the settlement conference program. This appeal will be assigned to this court's pilot program for processing proper person civil appeals. Appellant must file the enclosed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement within 30 days and serve the Appeal Statement on all parties to this case. Respondent is not required to file a response unless ordered to do so by this court. (Order removing appeal from settlement conference program and civil proper person appeal statement mailed to proper person appellant.) 05-24735
03/23/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. To date, appellant has failed to either file the civil appeal statement or request an extension of time in which to do so. It therefore appears that appellant may have abandoned this appeal. Accordingly, appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why her appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. 06-06166
06/12/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that appellant has abandoned her appeal, and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-12225
07/07/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-12379
07/07/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/13/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 10, 2006. 06-12379