judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00348-CV
01-82-00348-CV
05/14/1982
Miscellaneous/other civil
Rubin Larry E. aka Jim Roberts Allegheny Mutual
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/08/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/25/1984No description available.Refused
09/19/1983Petition for writ of error from trial court
08/19/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
08/12/1983Motion for rehearing filed
07/28/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/11/1983Submitted
03/24/1983Submission
02/02/1983Supplemental brief filed
01/25/1983Brief filed
01/06/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/16/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/30/1982Motion for rehearing disposedGrant motion
10/24/1982Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
10/14/1982Motion for rehearing filed
10/07/1982Opinion issuedDismissed for want of jurisdiction
09/16/1982Supplemental transcript filed
09/15/1982Motion to dismiss appeal
09/09/1982Brief filed
09/09/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/06/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/15/1982Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
07/09/1982Statement of facts filed
06/22/1982Motion to dismiss appeal
06/03/1982Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
05/17/1982Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
05/14/1982Transcript filed
05/06/1982Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/08/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellee
StateAppellant
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
28,323