judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUTTON (KEVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47958
Short Caption:SUTTON (KEVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34165 , 40477 , 53466 , 59378 , 63263 , 64244 , 65121 , 65652 , 67584 , 67905 , 71025 , 71025-COA , 73651 , 73651-COA , 74087 , 74087-COA , 75988 , 75988-COA , 77958 , 77958-COA , 79738 , 79738-COA , 80504 , 80504-COA , 82098
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C139518Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/30/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/30/2006Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Extraordinary Writ. 06-18059
09/20/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP07-NB/JH/RP 06-19362
10/17/2006RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 06-20885
10/17/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/23/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed October 5, 2006 and placed on the docket October 16, 2006 as Case No. 06-7102. 06-21789
12/11/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. 06-25290