judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KAY VS. NUNEZ

Case Information: 44090
Short Caption:KAY VS. NUNEZCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A479246Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/27/2004 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:02/06/2006 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:02/06/2006How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/18/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Garry L. Hayes--check no. 2817.
10/18/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-19237
10/27/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/01/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-20023
11/03/2004Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-20266
11/08/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 04-20594
11/22/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing. 04-21434
02/18/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-03384
02/28/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 05-03864
03/15/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/02/04. To Court Reporter: Jo A. Scott. 05-05060
05/13/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 08/02/04. Court Reporter: Jo A. Scott. 05-09370
06/01/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-10703
06/01/2005AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 05-10706
07/05/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. Clark County Board of Commissioners' Answering Brief. 05-13269
07/06/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. Oscar Nunez's Answering Brief. 05-13296
08/03/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief. 05-15416
09/22/2005BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Supplemental Memorandum to Appellant's Opening and Reply Briefs. 05-18871
12/19/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on February 6, 2006, at 11:30 a.m. (SNP06-WM/MG/JH)
01/23/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
02/06/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP06-WM/MG/JH
11/22/2006Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Maupin, Gibbons and Hardesty, JJ. Author: Hardesty, J. We concur: Maupin and Gibbons, JJ. 122 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 94. SNP06 06-23946
12/19/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-25507
12/19/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/02/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 21, 2006. 06-25507