judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

POLK (RENARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44087
Short Caption:POLK (RENARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38438 , 38941 , 39457 , 44258 , 49176 , 50147 , 50949 , 65813 , 69136 , 69136-COA , 71983 , 71983-COA , 73922 , 77508 , 77508-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C166490Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/10/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/15/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/15/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-19156
10/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] Nos. 44017/ 44072/ 44087 - cases are not consolidated. 04-19590
11/10/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 6. 04-20758
11/10/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/25/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Affirmance and Limited Remand to Correct the Judgment of Conviction. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED and REMAND this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of correcting the judgment of conviction. fn24[We have reviewed all documents that Polk has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted. To the extent that Polk has attempted to present claims or facts in those submissions that were no previously presented in the proceedings below, we have declined to consider them in the first instance.] SNP05-NB/RR/JH 05-01548
02/22/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-02163
02/22/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/07/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 24, 2005. 05-02163