judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GELSEBACH VS. GELT & CO.

Case Information: 34809
Short Caption:GELSEBACH VS. GELT & CO.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A323437Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/17/1999 / Earl, AllanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Keefer firm-check no. 051793.
09/10/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08554
09/17/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Allan R. Earl. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/25/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-10431
10/25/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-10432
11/17/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. SNP/CLK 99-11383
11/17/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
12/20/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Entry of Order (no action required). 99-12920