judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CONCERNED CITIZENS OF SPRING CREEK RANCH, SUYDAM ASSOCIATES LTD. PARTNERSHIP, HARVEST DANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC, A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, RONALD AND JOAN HARRIS, ADAM AND ELIZABETH MABERLY, DONNA L. FALK v. TIPS UP, L.L.C. and SPRING CREEK HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION and SPRING CREEK ARCHITECTURAL COMMITTEE

Case Heading (S-07-0159)
Case Number:S-07-0159Case Docketed On:07/17/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Corporations, Partnerships and Associations (Title 17)
Short Title:CONCERNED CITIZENS OF SPRING CREEK RANCH, SUYDAM ASSOCIATES LTD. PARTNERSHIP, HARVEST DANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC, A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, RONALD AND JOAN HARRIS, ADAM AND ELIZABETH MABERLY, DONNA L. FALK v. TIPS UP, L.L.C. and SPRING CREEK HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION and SPRING CREEK ARCHITECTURAL COMMITTEE
Full Title:CONCERNED CITIZENS OF SPRING CREEK RANCH, SUYDAM ASSOCIATES LTD. PARTNERSHIP, HARVEST DANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC, A UTAH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, RONALD AND JOAN HARRIS, ADAM AND ELIZABETH MABERLY, DONNA L. FALK, Appellants (Applicants for Intervention) v. TIPS UP, L.L.C., Appellee (Plaintiff) and SPRING CREEK HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION and SPRING CREEK ARCHITECTURAL COMMITTEE, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantConcered Citizens of Spring Creek RanchAbigail Susan Moore
Joseph F. Moore Jr.
AppellantSuydam Associates Ltd. PartnershipAbigail Susan Moore
Joseph F. Moore Jr.
AppellantHarvest Dance Associates, LLCAbigail Susan Moore
Joseph F. Moore Jr.
AppellantRonald HarrisAbigail Susan Moore
Joseph F. Moore Jr.
AppellantJoan HarrisAbigail Susan Moore
Joseph F. Moore Jr.
AppellantAdam MaberlyAbigail Susan Moore
Joseph F. Moore Jr.
AppellantElizabeth MaberlyAbigail Susan Moore
Joseph F. Moore Jr.
AppellantDonna L. FalkAbigail Susan Moore
Joseph F. Moore Jr.
AppelleeTips Up, LLCDavid B. Hooper
Raymond E. Loughrey
AppelleeSpring Creek Homeowners' AssociationEdward Frank Hess
William H. Short
AppelleeSpring Creek Architectural CommitteeEdward Frank Hess
William H. Short

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 64
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/17/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/17/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/31/2007Motion - Other. Motion to correct caption.MotionOtherFinal
08/31/2007Order - Amending caption. Order granting motion to correct caption.OrderAmending captionFinal
09/04/2007Brief - Appellant - Concerned Citizens of Spring Creek RanchBriefAppellantFinal
09/07/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
09/10/2007Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
09/18/2007Order - Pro hac vice - allow - William H. Short for appellees Spring Creek Homeowners' Association and Spring Creek Architectural CommitteeOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
10/18/2007Brief - Appellees Spring Creek Homeowners' Assocation and Spring Creek Architectural Committee and copy of brief on cdBriefAppelleeFinal
10/18/2007Motion - Dismiss - involuntary or in the alternative order to show causeMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
10/22/2007Brief - Appellee Tips Up, L.L.C.BriefAppelleeFinal
10/24/2007Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
10/25/2007Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Raymond E. Loughrey pro hac vice for Tips Up, LLC.OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
10/30/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Chief Justice Voigt recusedNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
11/01/2007Response/Objection - Motion to dismiss appeal or issuance of show cause order.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
11/06/2007Order - Denying combined motionOrderDenyFinal
11/07/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/08/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - William H. Short for Concerned CitizensNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Abigail More for appellantsNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/16/2007Order - Assignment of judge - Judge Arnold for Chief Justice VoigtOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
11/19/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Exhibits to PleadingsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David B. Hooper on behalf of appellee Tips Up, LLCNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/12/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Justices Golden, Hill, Kite and Burke, and Arnold, DJ (Abigail Moore for appellants; Edward Frank Hess, William H. Short and David B. Hooper, argument by Messrs. Short and Hooper for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/12/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/10/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, District Judge Arnold writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/26/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/02/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 6/30/08 by E. Johnson.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal