judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LOUIS M. MEDLEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1016
Short Caption:LOUIS M. MEDLEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-5280-07Filed Date:08/10/2010

Opening Event Date:08/10/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/30/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLouis M. Medley Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/31/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER of the Superior Court. See DC Code 11-721 (2001). (BY: ETW)
08/31/2010TMC - OTSC
11/08/2010 ORDERED that this appeal is HEREBY DISMISSED as having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER... (OBNBST) (kt)
11/08/2010DISMISSED
11/30/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived