judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

SOUTHERN TRUST AND MORTGAGE COMPANY v. MRS. R. J. DANIEL

Case: A-324
A-324
08/29/1944
Application for Writ of Error
SOUTHERN TRUST AND MORTGAGE COMPANY
MRS. R. J. DANIEL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/10/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/29/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/10/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/30/1944Letter Filed
10/24/1944Bond
10/18/1944Document received (See Remarks)
08/29/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/29/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. R. J. DanielRespondent
Southern Trust and Mortgage CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information